|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6441.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5308.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 4771.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|