Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |