California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 29, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016