BILL NUMBER: AB 2621ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 12, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Gomez and Bloom (Coauthors: Assembly Members Maienschein and McCarty) (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Block, and Vidak) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 44050 to the Education Code, relating to school employees. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2621, Gomez. Employee Codes of Conduct. Existing law requires local educational agencies to provide certain documents to parents and post certain documents on an Internet Web site. This bill would require a local educational agency, as specified, or a person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation offering or conducting private school instruction at the elementary or high school level, as specified, that maintains an employee code of conduct with pupils to, commencing July 1, 2017, provide a written copy of the code of conduct to the parent or guardian of each enrolled pupil at the beginning of each school year and, commencing January 1, 2017, to post the code of conduct, or provide a link to it, on each of its schools' Internet Web sites, or, if a school of a local educational agency does not have its own Internet Web site, on the local educational agency's Internet Web site, in a publicly accessible manner. The bill would also provide that a local educational agency may satisfy the individual parent notification requirement by including a copy of the code of conduct with other specified notifications that are required at the beginning of the first semester or quarter of the regular school term. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 44050 is added to the Education Code, to read: 44050. (a) A local educational agency, or a person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation offering or conducting private school instruction at the elementary or high school level, that maintains an employee code of conduct with pupils shall do both of the following: (1) Commencing July 1, 2017, provide a written copy of the code of conduct to the parent or guardian of each enrolled pupil at the beginning of each school year. (2) Commencing January 1, 2017, post the code of conduct, or provide a link to it, on each of its schools' Internet Web sites, or, if a school of a local educational agency does not have its own Internet Web site, on the local educational agency's Internet Web site, in a manner that is accessible to the public without a password. (b) A local educational agency may satisfy the requirement to provide a written copy of the code of conduct to the parent or guardian of each enrolled pupil by including the code of conduct in the notice required pursuant to Section 48980. (c) For purposes of this section, a local educational agency includes a school district, county office of education, or charter school. (d) This section shall not be construed to require a local educational agency, a school within a local educational agency, or a private school to create an Internet Web site if it does not have one. (e) This section does not apply to a private school composed of parents or legal guardians working exclusively with their own children.