California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 19, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016