|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6198.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5122.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 5040.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|