California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2629 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016