Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2015 | Read first time. To print. |