California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016