Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4614.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|