LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB264
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB264
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB264
Compare Versions
AB264 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB264 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB264 Amended July 16, 2015
AB264 Amended June 8, 2015
AB264 Amended April 21, 2015
AB264 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB264 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB264 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB264 Amended July 16, 2015
AB264 Amended June 8, 2015
AB264 Amended April 21, 2015
AB264 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare