California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016