California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2653 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016