|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4717.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4675.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|