California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 9, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016