LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB266
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB266
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB266
Compare Versions
AB266 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB266 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB266 Amended September 11, 2015
AB266 Amended September 4, 2015
AB266 Amended September 1, 2015
AB266 Amended August 17, 2015
AB266 Amended July 13, 2015
AB266 Amended June 30, 2015
AB266 Amended June 2, 2015
AB266 Amended May 11, 2015
AB266 Amended May 5, 2015
AB266 Amended April 14, 2015
AB266 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB266 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB266 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB266 Amended September 11, 2015
AB266 Amended September 4, 2015
AB266 Amended September 1, 2015
AB266 Amended August 17, 2015
AB266 Amended July 13, 2015
AB266 Amended June 30, 2015
AB266 Amended June 2, 2015
AB266 Amended May 11, 2015
AB266 Amended May 5, 2015
AB266 Amended April 14, 2015
AB266 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare