California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016