Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5795.) Stricken from file. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 36. Page 5052.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Thurmond. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4852.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |