|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 2908.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2392.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 1138.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 966.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|