Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |