LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2685
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2685
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2685
Compare Versions
AB2685 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB2685 Enrolled August 18, 2016
AB2685 Amended May 11, 2016
AB2685 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2685 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2685 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2685 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB2685 Enrolled August 18, 2016
AB2685 Amended May 11, 2016
AB2685 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2685 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2685 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare