|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4500.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|