Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |