Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |