|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5241.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|