California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2710 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 13, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016