California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2713 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016