Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5042.) | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |