Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.) | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |