|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2051.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|