California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2722 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016