|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 6458.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5367.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5185.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5074.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|