|
09/13/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6490.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5416.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4033.) (pending re-referral to Com. on INS.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|