California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2732 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2732ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Chang and Low (Coauthors: Assembly Members Calderon, Harper, and Linder) (Coauthor: Senator Nguyen) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 66302.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2732, Chang. Public postsecondary education: mandatory orientation for students. Existing law establishes the University of California, under the administration of the Regents of the University of California, and the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as 2 of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law requests the Trustees of the California State University and the Regents of the University of California to adopt and publish policies on harassment, intimidation, and bullying to be included within the rules and regulations governing student behavior within their respective segments of public postsecondary education. The bill would require the Trustees of the California State University, and request the Regents of the University of California, to provide, as part of established campus orientations, educational and preventive information about cyberbullying to students at all campuses of their respective segments. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66302.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66302.5. The Trustees of the California State University shall provide, and the Regents of the University of California are requested to provide, as part of established campus orientations, educational and preventive information about cyberbullying to students at all campuses of their respective segments.