Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4625.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |