California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2737 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 24, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016