California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016