California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 27, 2015