|
09/26/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6537.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5339.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4687.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|