California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016