Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5076.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 5138.) | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 4994.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | May 27-Motion to reconsider continued. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 32. Page 4692.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gatto. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |