|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2768.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2291.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 1014.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|