|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 274, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5011.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 5178.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5075.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|