Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |