LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB276
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB276
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB276
Compare Versions
AB276 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB276 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB276 Amended August 31, 2015
AB276 Amended June 11, 2015
AB276 Amended May 28, 2015
AB276 Amended March 17, 2015
AB276 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB276 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB276 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB276 Amended August 31, 2015
AB276 Amended June 11, 2015
AB276 Amended May 28, 2015
AB276 Amended March 17, 2015
AB276 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare