|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 6398.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5256.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|