|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2454.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|