Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Measure version as amended on March 28 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|