LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2785
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2785
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2785
Compare Versions
AB2785 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2785 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2785 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2785 Amended April 27, 2016
AB2785 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2785 Amended March 17, 2016
AB2785 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2785 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2785 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2785 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2785 Amended April 27, 2016
AB2785 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2785 Amended March 17, 2016
AB2785 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare