|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 6491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5418.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|